Our ncert solutions for Solutions 2. Whole Numbers - Exercise 2.3 | Class 6 Mathematics - Toppers Study is the best material for English Medium students cbse board and other state boards students.

# Solutions 2. Whole Numbers - Exercise 2.3 | Class 6 Mathematics - Toppers Study

Topper Study classes prepares ncert solutions on practical base problems and comes out with the best result that helps the students and teachers as well as tutors and so many ecademic coaching classes that they need in practical life. Our ncert solutions for Solutions 2. Whole Numbers - Exercise 2.3 | Class 6 Mathematics - Toppers Study is the best material for English Medium students cbse board and other state boards students.

## 2. Whole Numbers

### | Exercise 2.3 |

## Solutions 2. Whole Numbers - Exercise 2.3 | Class 6 Mathematics - Toppers Study

### Exercise-2.3

**Q1. Which of the following will not represent zero:
(a) 1 + 0 (b) 0 × 0 (c) ^{0}/_{2} (d) ^{10 -10}/_{2 } **

**Solution:**

**(a) 1 + 0 **= 1

So, it is not represent zero

**(b) 0 × 0 **= 0

it is represent zero

**(c) 0/2 = 0**

it is represent zero

**Q2. If the product of two whole numbers is zero, can we say that one or both of them will be zero? Justify through examples.**

**Solution: **

Yes, we know that the product of any whole numbers with zero is always zero.

**Q3. If the product of two whole numbers is 1, can we say that one or both of them will be 1? Justify through examples.**

**Solution: **

If only one number be 1 then the product cannot be 1.

**Examples:**

Here we see that one of two is 1 then product will be always second number.

If both numbers are 1, then the product is 1

Q4. Find using distributive property :

(a) 728 × 101 (b) 5437 × 1001 (c) 824 × 25 (d) 4275 × 125 (e) 504 × 35

**Solution: **

**(a) 728 × 101**

= 728(100 + 1)

= 728 × 100 + 728 × 1

= 72800 + 728

= 73528

**Solution:**

**(b) 5437 × 1001**

= 5437(1000 + 1)

= 5437 × 1000 + 5437 × 1

= 5437000 + 5437

= 5442437

**Solution:**

**(c) 824 × 25**

= 824(20 + 5)

= 824 × 20 + 824 × 5

= 16480 + 4120

= 20600

**Solution: **

(d) 4275 × 125

= 4275(100 + 20 + 5)

= 4275 × 100 + 4275 × 20 + 4275 × 5

= 427500 + 85500 + 21375

= 534375

**Solution: **

**(e) 504 × 35 **

= (500 + 4) × 35

= 500 × 35 + 4 × 35

= 17500 + 140

= 17640

Q5. Study the pattern :

1 × 8 + 1 = 9 1234 × 8 + 4 = 9876

12 × 8 + 2 = 98 12345 × 8 + 5 = 98765

123 × 8 + 3 = 987

Write the next two steps. Can you say how the pattern works?

(Hint: 12345 = 11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1).

##### Other Pages of this Chapter: 2. Whole Numbers

### Select Your CBSE Classes

Important Study materials for classes 06, 07, 08,09,10, 11 and 12. Like CBSE Notes, Notes for Science, Notes for maths, Notes for Social Science, Notes for Accountancy, Notes for Economics, Notes for political Science, Noes for History, Notes For Bussiness Study, Physical Educations, Sample Papers, Test Papers, Mock Test Papers, Support Materials and Books.

*Mathematics Class - 11th*

NCERT Maths book for CBSE Students.

books

## Study Materials List:

##### Solutions ⇒ Class 6th ⇒ Mathematics

## Topper's Study

New Books